Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Eviction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020
Title
Real Property - Residential Rental Property - Annual Eviction Moratorium
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 (SB0544)
Title
State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
Anne Arundel County - Service of Summary Ejectment Papers - Sheriff's Surcharge and Authorization for Private Process Server
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 /CH0457 (SB0787)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517
Title
Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540 (SB1067)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 (HB0797)
Title
State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1313/CH0457)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1067 (HB1540)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 Real Property - Residential Rental Property - Annual Eviction Moratorium Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Delegate Jackson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0797 (SB0544) State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0976 Anne Arundel County - Service of Summary Ejectment Papers - Sheriff's Surcharge and Authorization for Private Process Server Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB1313 /CH0457 (SB0787) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1517 Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1540 (SB1067) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0544 (HB0797) State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0787 (HB1313/CH0457) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB1067 (HB1540) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:53 PM