Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 (SB0625)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345 /CH0360 (SB0908/CH0359)
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0554)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 /CH0359 (HB1345/CH0360)
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0554 (SB0625) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1345 /CH0360 (SB0908/CH0359) Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits Delegate McHale 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0625 (HB0554) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0908 /CH0359 (HB1345/CH0360) Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM