Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014 /CH0657 (SB0058/CH0656)
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax Cap - Amount and Repeal of Termination
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082
Title
Stormwater Management - Assessment of Local Fees, Charges, and Excise Taxes - Leasehold Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 /CH0728
Title
Vehicle Laws - Trade-In Allowance - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042
Title
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0656 (HB0014/CH0657)
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax Cap - Amount and Repeal of Termination
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0014 /CH0657 (SB0058/CH0656) Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax Cap - Amount and Repeal of Termination Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0082 Stormwater Management - Assessment of Local Fees, Charges, and Excise Taxes - Leasehold Interests Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0986 /CH0728 Vehicle Laws - Trade-In Allowance - Leased Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0656 (HB0014/CH0657) Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax Cap - Amount and Repeal of Termination Senator Astle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM