Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 /CH0362 (SB0315)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186 (SB0927)
Title
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 /CH0344
Title
Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise Tax
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 (HB0406/CH0362)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 /CH0363
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 /CH0663 (HB1360)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 (HB1186)
Title
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0110 Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - Extension Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0406 /CH0362 (SB0315) Clean Cars Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1186 (SB0927) Excise Tax and Sales Tax - Cannabis Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663) Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption Delegate Hixson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0034 /CH0344 Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise Tax Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0315 (HB0406/CH0362) Clean Cars Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0393 /CH0363 Clean Cars Act of 2017 Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0449 /CH0663 (HB1360) Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 (HB1186) Excise Tax and Sales Tax - Cannabis Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM