Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072
Title
Extension of Electric Vehicle Incentives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Vessel Excise Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Transfer of Unsalvageable Boat
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Transportation - Vehicle Titling Fee and Vehicle Excise Tax - Active Duty Members of the Military
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 /CH0213
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078
Title
Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Sunset - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Electronic Collection and Remission of Vehicle Excise Taxes
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 Extension of Electric Vehicle Incentives Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0872 Vessel Excise Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Transfer of Unsalvageable Boat Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 Transportation - Vehicle Titling Fee and Vehicle Excise Tax - Active Duty Members of the Military Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1246 /CH0213 Clean Cars Act of 2019 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Sunset - Repeal Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1021 Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Electronic Collection and Remission of Vehicle Excise Taxes Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM