Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 (SB0354)
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0333)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 /CH0052 (SB0415/CH0051)
Title
Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 (SB0571)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698 /CH0241 (SB0356/CH0240)
Title
Ex-Offender Business Development Program Study
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0493)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Learn'In to Live Again Project
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 /CH0041 (SB0282/CH0040)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0792)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133
Title
Public Safety - Restrictions on Possession of Firearms - Convicted Felons and People with Mental Disorders
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350
Title
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Reinvestment of Savings to Prisoner Reentry Programs
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 (SB0635)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender - Entry Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0040 (HB1053/CH0041)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0326)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0054)
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356 /CH0240 (HB0698/CH0241)
Title
Ex-Offender Business Development Program Study
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0051 (HB0442/CH0052)
Title
Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care Providers
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0710)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Learn'In to Live Again Project
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0541)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635 (HB1403)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender - Entry Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 (HB1099)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0054 (SB0354) Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0326 (SB0333) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0442 /CH0052 (SB0415/CH0051) Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care Providers Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0541 (SB0571) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0698 /CH0241 (SB0356/CH0240) Ex-Offender Business Development Program Study Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0710 (SB0493) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Learn'In to Live Again Project Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB1053 /CH0041 (SB0282/CH0040) Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling Delegate Robinson, B. 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Ways and Means
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0792) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1133 Public Safety - Restrictions on Possession of Firearms - Convicted Felons and People with Mental Disorders Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB1255 Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Reinvestment of Savings to Prisoner Reentry Programs Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB1403 (SB0635) Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender - Entry Restrictions Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0282 /CH0040 (HB1053/CH0041) Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 (HB0326) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0054) Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0356 /CH0240 (HB0698/CH0241) Ex-Offender Business Development Program Study Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Finance
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0415 /CH0051 (HB0442/CH0052) Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care Providers Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 (HB0710) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Learn'In to Live Again Project Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
SB0571 (HB0541) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Rehabilitation Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0635 (HB1403) Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender - Entry Restrictions Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards Senator Getty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 (HB1099) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM