Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264 /CH0480
Title
Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in Business
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
Correctional Services - Senior Reentry Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510
Title
Program for the Long-Term Employment of Qualified Ex-Felons
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716
Title
Election Law - Voting by Felons at Polling Places - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Job Training Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Public Safety - Crime Gun Reporting and Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858
Title
Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 (SB0923)
Title
Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of Prohibition and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151 (SB0547)
Title
Ex-Offenders Recidivism Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195
Title
Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional Education
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0978)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259
Title
Election Law - Voting by Registered Offenders at Polling Places - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268 /CH0506
Title
Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent Felon
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547 (HB1151)
Title
Ex-Offenders Recidivism Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804
Title
State Government - Occupational Licensing of Ex-Offenders - Transfer of Statutory Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921 /CH0002 (HB1106/CH0001)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923 (HB0979)
Title
Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 (HB1232)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1101
Title
Jurors - Qualification - Prior Conviction
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0264 /CH0480 Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in Business Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0284 Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0498 Correctional Services - Senior Reentry Coordinating Council Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0510 Program for the Long-Term Employment of Qualified Ex-Felons Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0716 Election Law - Voting by Felons at Polling Places - Prohibition Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
HB0748 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Job Training Grant Program - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0846 Public Safety - Crime Gun Reporting and Analysis Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - Expansion Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0979 (SB0923) Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of Prohibition and Task Force Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002) Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions Delegate Frick 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Economic Matters
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1126 Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1151 (SB0547) Ex-Offenders Recidivism Reduction Act Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional Education Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 (SB0978) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 Election Law - Voting by Registered Offenders at Polling Places - Prohibition Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1268 /CH0506 Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent Felon Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0547 (HB1151) Ex-Offenders Recidivism Reduction Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0804 State Government - Occupational Licensing of Ex-Offenders - Transfer of Statutory Provisions Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0921 /CH0002 (HB1106/CH0001) Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions Senator Pugh 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0923 (HB0979) Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of Prohibition Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0978 (HB1232) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
SB1101 Jurors - Qualification - Prior Conviction Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM