Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 /CH0568
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 (SB0236/CH0750)
Title
Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095
Title
Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique Firearm (Shadé's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 (SB0219)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0689 (SB0547/CH0690)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0691)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Opportunity Zone Employers - Formerly Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994 (SB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Violent Offender Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167 /CH0726
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1234
Title
Procurement - Correctional Facilities - Ex-Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238
Title
Correctional Facilities - Employment - Ex-Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 (HB0503)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0750 (HB0073)
Title
Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 /CH0458
Title
Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547 /CH0690 (HB0723/CH0689)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0782)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB0994)
Title
Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044
Title
Labor and Employment - Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 /CH0568 Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Economic Matters
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0073 (SB0236/CH0750) Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0095 Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique Firearm (Shadé's Law) Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB0502 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 (SB0219) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0723 /CH0689 (SB0547/CH0690) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Revisions Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0782 (SB0691) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0918 Income Tax - Credit for Opportunity Zone Employers - Formerly Incarcerated Individuals Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0994 (SB0839) Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box) Delegate Mosby 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1023 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Violent Offender Registry Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1167 /CH0726 Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Establishment Delegate Haynes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Economic Matters
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1234 Procurement - Correctional Facilities - Ex-Offenders Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1238 Correctional Facilities - Employment - Ex-Offenders Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 (HB0503) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0236 /CH0750 (HB0073) Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0346 /CH0458 Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0547 /CH0690 (HB0723/CH0689) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Revisions Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0691 (HB0782) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0839 (HB0994) Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box) Senator Carter 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
3/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0974 Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1044 Labor and Employment - Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM