Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 (SB0091)
Title
Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 (SB0207)
Title
Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 (SB0273)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568 (SB0372)
Title
Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835
Title
Labor and Employment - Incentive Programs for Hiring and Retraining - List
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0926)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 (SB0858)
Title
Procurement and Correctional Facilities - Employment Opportunities for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1566
Title
Maryland Correctional Enterprises - Workgroup on Vocational Training and Placement
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638 (SB1052)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Entry Onto School Property
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0051)
Title
Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 (HB0206)
Title
Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 (HB1029)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0356)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 (HB0568)
Title
Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 (HB1524)
Title
Procurement and Correctional Facilities - Employment Opportunities for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB1425)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1052 (HB1638)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Entry Onto School Property
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 (SB0091) Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/16/2020 - 1:30 PM
HB0206 (SB0207) Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services Delegate Krimm 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 (SB0273) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 (SB0372) Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0835 Labor and Employment - Incentive Programs for Hiring and Retraining - List Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1141 Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Report Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training Delegate Jackson, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1425 (SB0926) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1524 (SB0858) Procurement and Correctional Facilities - Employment Opportunities for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1566 Maryland Correctional Enterprises - Workgroup on Vocational Training and Placement Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 (SB1052) Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Entry Onto School Property Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0091 (HB0051) Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0157 Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability - Immunity Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 (HB0206) Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0224 (HB1029) Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Finance
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 (HB0356) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 (HB0568) Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0858 (HB1524) Procurement and Correctional Facilities - Employment Opportunities for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0921 Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0926 (HB1425) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1052 (HB1638) Criminal Procedure - Registered Sex Offenders - Entry Onto School Property Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 11:12 AM