Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Explosives -see also- Fireworks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719
Title
Criminal Law - False Statement Concerning Destructive Device or Toxic Material - Venue
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738
Title
Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - False Statements About Destructive Devices or Toxic Materials
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871
Title
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of False Statements Concerning Destructive Devices or Toxic Materials
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0719 Criminal Law - False Statement Concerning Destructive Device or Toxic Material - Venue Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0738 Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - False Statements About Destructive Devices or Toxic Materials Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Senator Gladden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of False Statements Concerning Destructive Devices or Toxic Materials Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM