Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Explosives -see also- Fireworks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0661)
Title
Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 (SB1037/CH0747)
Title
Montgomery County - Fire and Explosive Investigator - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 (HB0240)
Title
Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 /CH0747 (HB0460)
Title
Montgomery County – Fire and Explosive Investigator – Definition
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0240 (SB0661) Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0460 (SB1037/CH0747) Montgomery County - Fire and Explosive Investigator - Definition Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0661 (HB0240) Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1037 /CH0747 (HB0460) Montgomery County – Fire and Explosive Investigator – Definition Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 747
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM