Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Expungement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 /CH0213 (SB0068)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195 (SB0211)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 /CH0399 (SB0314/CH0153)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 (SB0376)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Subsequent Conviction or Pending Criminal Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601
Title
Criminal Procedure - Explanation of Expungement Provisions Relating to Proposed Disposition of Charge
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680
Title
Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682 (SB0545)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0896
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 (SB0722)
Title
Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 (HB0079/CH0213)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor and Felony Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0195)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314 /CH0153 (HB0402/CH0399)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 (HB0410)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 (HB0682)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1330)
Title
Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1055
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0079 /CH0213 (SB0068) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0195 (SB0211) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 /CH0399 (SB0314/CH0153) Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Delegate Oaks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0410 (SB0376) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Subsequent Conviction or Pending Criminal Proceeding Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Failed (69-65)
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0601 Criminal Procedure - Explanation of Expungement Provisions Relating to Proposed Disposition of Charge Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0680 Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0682 (SB0545) Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0773 Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0896 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Convictions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 (SB0722) Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 (HB0079/CH0213) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor and Felony Convictions Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0211 (HB0195) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0314 /CH0153 (HB0402/CH0399) Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 (HB0410) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0452 Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0545 (HB0682) Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0722 (HB1330) Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1055 Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM