Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Expungement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0007 (SB0031/CH0152)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0328)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Identity Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0712)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Nonviolent Felonies - Stet, Shielding, and Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Acquittal, Dismissal, and Nolle Prosequi
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956 (SB0741)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nonviolent Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Acquittal, Dismissal, and Nolle Prosequi
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law Battery
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 /CH0152 (HB0007)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152
Title
Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for Intoxication
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nolle Prosequi
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0329
Title
Criminal Procedure - Nonviolent Felonies - Stet, Shielding, and Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712 (HB0770)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Nonviolent Felonies - Stet, Shielding, and Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0956)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890
Title
Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0007 (SB0031/CH0152) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0220 (SB0328) Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement Delegate Barron 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0268 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0286 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Identity Theft Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0590 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Probation Before Judgment Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0770 (SB0712) Criminal Procedure - Nonviolent Felonies - Stet, Shielding, and Expungement Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0914 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Acquittal, Dismissal, and Nolle Prosequi Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0956 (SB0741) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1294 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nonviolent Convictions Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1317 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Acquittal, Dismissal, and Nolle Prosequi Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1436 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law Battery Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1580 Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0031 /CH0152 (HB0007) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period Senator DeGrange 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0152 Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for Intoxication Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0215 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nolle Prosequi Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0329 Criminal Procedure - Nonviolent Felonies - Stet, Shielding, and Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0712 (HB0770) Criminal Procedure - Nonviolent Felonies - Stet, Shielding, and Expungement Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 (HB0956) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0890 Expungement - Misdemeanor Convictions Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM