Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Expungement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357
Title
Expungement - Fee - Baltimore City Consent Decree
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 (SB0949/CH0801)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 /CH0703
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law Battery
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0717
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB0928)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Court and Police Records - Acquittal, Dismissal, or Nolle Prosequi
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 (HB1185)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 /CH0801 (HB0379)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0357 Expungement - Fee - Baltimore City Consent Decree Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 (SB0949/CH0801) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0836 /CH0703 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law Battery Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1017 /CH0717 Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 (SB0928) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1237 Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Court and Police Records - Acquittal, Dismissal, or Nolle Prosequi Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0510 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 Criminal Procedure - Petition for Expungement Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0928 (HB1185) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0949 /CH0801 (HB0379) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM