Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Expungement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 /CH0686
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Civil Offense
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Law Enforcement Misconduct - Erroneous Conviction Compensation and Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Criminal Law - Third-Degree Assault
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0555 (SB0257)
Title
Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 (SB0593)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193
Title
Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and Effects
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 (SB0869)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 (SB0881)
Title
Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1383 (SB1212)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0413
Title
Child Support - Employment Program Participation - Reinstatement of Driver's License and Expungement of Suspension
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0143
Title
Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug Treatment
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0555)
Title
Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB1082)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1267)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1276)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1212 (HB1383)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1246
Title
Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0382 /CH0686 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Civil Offense Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 Law Enforcement Misconduct - Erroneous Conviction Compensation and Expungement Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0488 Criminal Law - Third-Degree Assault Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0555 (SB0257) Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1057 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 (SB0593) Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1193 Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and Effects Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 (SB0869) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 (SB0881) Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1383 (SB1212) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018) Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 /CH0413 Child Support - Employment Program Participation - Reinstatement of Driver's License and Expungement of Suspension Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 /CH0143 Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug Treatment Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 (HB0555) Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0593 (HB1082) Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0869 (HB1267) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1276) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1212 (HB1383) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018) Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1246 Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM