Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Expungement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081 /CH0045 (SB0735)
Title
Criminal Law – Sodomy – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 (SB0699)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Charge of Possession of Marijuana – Removal From Case Search
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 (SB0848)
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Explanation of Unit Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336 (SB0589)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement, Maryland Judiciary Case Search, and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527 (SB0833)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confidentiality of Records
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB1336)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Maryland Judiciary Case Search
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 (HB0083)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Maryland Judiciary Case Search – Possession of Marijuana Records
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811
Title
Criminal Procedure – Maryland Judiciary Case Search – Case Blocking
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB1527)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1209)
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0081 /CH0045 (SB0735) Criminal Law – Sodomy – Repeal Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 45
Judiciary
1/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0083 (SB0699) Criminal Procedure – Charge of Possession of Marijuana – Removal From Case Search Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 126
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1209 (SB0848) Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1247 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Explanation of Unit Rule Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1336 (SB0589) Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement, Maryland Judiciary Case Search, and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction Delegate Barron 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1343 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1527 (SB0833) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0314 Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confidentiality of Records Senator Sydnor 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/17/2020 - 5:00 PM
SB0589 (HB1336) Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Maryland Judiciary Case Search Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0687 Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0699 (HB0083) Criminal Procedure – Maryland Judiciary Case Search – Possession of Marijuana Records Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0811 Criminal Procedure – Maryland Judiciary Case Search – Case Blocking Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0833 (HB1527) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0848 (HB1209) Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0972 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:11 PM