Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Extortion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Related Crimes - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461 (SB0388)
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0537 (SB0178/CH0536)
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 (SB0866)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1578 (SB0504)
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Threatening to Withhold Governmental Services
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0536 (HB0493/CH0537)
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB0461)
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB1578)
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Threatening to Withhold Governmental Services
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866 (HB0623)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking Victim
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0101 Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Related Crimes - Penalties Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0461 (SB0388) Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0493 /CH0537 (SB0178/CH0536) Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0623 (SB0866) Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking Victim Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1578 (SB0504) Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Threatening to Withhold Governmental Services Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0178 /CH0536 (HB0493/CH0537) Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0388 (HB0461) Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0504 (HB1578) Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Threatening to Withhold Governmental Services Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0866 (HB0623) Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking Victim Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
SB1023 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM