Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Extortion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0376)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 (HB0456)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 /CH0365
Title
Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1276)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0456 (SB0376) Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 (HB0456) Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0769 /CH0365 Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1276) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM