Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423 (SB0608)
Title
Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546 /CH0245 (SB0031/CH0246)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 /CH0246 (HB0546/CH0245)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 (HB0423)
Title
Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0423 (SB0608) Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 /CH0245 (SB0031/CH0246) Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 245
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0031 /CH0246 (HB0546/CH0245) Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 246
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0608 (HB0423) Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:03 PM