Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 /CH0430 (SB0538)
Title
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0763
Title
Task Force to Study the Effectiveness of Teacher Education Programs in the Instruction of Reading
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0934 /CH0465 (SB0210/CH0466)
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967 (SB0725)
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 (SB0806)
Title
State Board of Education - High School Assessment - Government
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 /CH0466 (HB0934/CH0465)
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy Protection
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Great Preschools Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493
Title
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0535/CH0430)
Title
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691
Title
Maryland After-School and Summer Opportunity Fund Program - Funding Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB0967)
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for Schools
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0806 (HB1200)
Title
State Board of Education - High School Assessment - Government
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924
Title
County Boards of Education - Private Financing Authority
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0535 /CH0430 (SB0538) Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction Delegate Turner 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0668 Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Attorney's Fees Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0763 Task Force to Study the Effectiveness of Teacher Education Programs in the Instruction of Reading Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0934 /CH0465 (SB0210/CH0466) Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy Protection Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0967 (SB0725) Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for Schools Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1200 (SB0806) State Board of Education - High School Assessment - Government Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0210 /CH0466 (HB0934/CH0465) Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy Protection Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0363 Great Preschools Tax Credit Program Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0493 Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of Maryland Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0538 (HB0535/CH0430) Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 Maryland After-School and Summer Opportunity Fund Program - Funding Requirement Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0725 (HB0967) Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for Schools Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0806 (HB1200) State Board of Education - High School Assessment - Government Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0924 County Boards of Education - Private Financing Authority Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM