Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 /CH0356 (SB0049)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Cecil and Queen Anne's Counties - Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0350 /CH0100
Title
Business Regulation - Outdoor Musical Festival Promoter License - Repeal of Safety Permit Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0387 (SB0767)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 /CH0396
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121 /CH0272 (SB0459/CH0271)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Provision of Services at a Community-Based Health Fair
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425
Title
Cecil County - Special Wine Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0271 (HB1121/CH0272)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Provision of Services at a Community-Based Health Fair
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Licenses
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 (HB0749/CH0387)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009
Title
Special Thoroughbred Racing - State Fair Society - Racing Days
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0212 /CH0356 (SB0049) Alcoholic Beverages - Cecil and Queen Anne's Counties - Beer and Wine Festivals Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0300 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer Festival Licenses Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0350 /CH0100 Business Regulation - Outdoor Musical Festival Promoter License - Repeal of Safety Permit Requirement Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 /CH0387 (SB0767) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0978 /CH0396 Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1121 /CH0272 (SB0459/CH0271) Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Provision of Services at a Community-Based Health Fair Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1425 Cecil County - Special Wine Festival Licenses Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0459 /CH0271 (HB1121/CH0272) Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Provision of Services at a Community-Based Health Fair Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Licenses Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 (HB0749/CH0387) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations Senator Edwards 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1009 Special Thoroughbred Racing - State Fair Society - Racing Days Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM