Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 /CH0236
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit Holders - Comptroller Notification and Attendance Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 (SB0348)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 (SB0673/CH0192)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited - Companion Animal Welfare Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1271 (SB0922/CH0210)
Title
City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore County - License Fees
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0231
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer and Wine Festival License
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339 /CH0026
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Belvedere Square
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 (HB0525)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 /CH0192 (HB0526)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 /CH0210 (HB1271)
Title
City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals and Street Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0290 /CH0236 Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit Holders - Comptroller Notification and Attendance Restrictions Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0525 (SB0348) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0526 (SB0673/CH0192) Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit Delegate Barkley 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0645 Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited - Companion Animal Welfare Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1271 (SB0922/CH0210) City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0046 Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore County - License Fees Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0231 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer and Wine Festival License Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0339 /CH0026 Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Belvedere Square Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 (HB0525) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0673 /CH0192 (HB0526) Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0922 /CH0210 (HB1271) City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals and Street Festival Licenses Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM