Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 /CH0048 (SB0101/CH0047)
Title
St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0305
Title
Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0780
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm Fair
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0047 (HB0194/CH0048)
Title
St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0194 /CH0048 (SB0101/CH0047) St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0309 /CH0305 Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0780 Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm Fair Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 /CH0047 (HB0194/CH0048) St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM