Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480 (SB0508)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0563 /CH0169
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666 /CH0397
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival Permit - Retail Off-Site Permit
Sponsor
Economic Matters Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 /CH0699 (SB0667/CH0700)
Title
Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 (SB0709)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1419 (SB0563)
Title
Zoning - Special Exceptions - Construction or Operation of Landfills
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 (HB0480)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0667 /CH0700 (HB0866/CH0699)
Title
Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB1415)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0480 (SB0508) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0563 /CH0169 Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0666 /CH0397 Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival Permit - Retail Off-Site Permit Economic Matters Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 /CH0699 (SB0667/CH0700) Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1415 (SB0709) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1419 (SB0563) Zoning - Special Exceptions - Construction or Operation of Landfills Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0508 (HB0480) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0667 /CH0700 (HB0866/CH0699) Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0709 (HB1415) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM