Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010 (SB0052)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 (SB0165)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0090
Title
Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0380 (SB0534)
Title
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 /CH0633
Title
Commission on Child Custody Decision Making
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 (SB0620)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748 (SB0503)
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 (SB0417)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Family Law - Modification of Child Custody or Denial of Visitation - Expedited Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0792)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1480
Title
Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of Three
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 (HB0010)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Absolute Divorce - Time Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB0022)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178
Title
Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0853)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 (HB0748)
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534 (HB0631/CH0380)
Title
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or Neglect
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 (HB0849)
Title
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0715)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 (HB1099)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1024
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 (SB0052) Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0022 (SB0165) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0245 /CH0090 Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0631 /CH0380 (SB0534) Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or Neglect Delegate Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0687 /CH0633 Commission on Child Custody Decision Making Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0715 (SB0620) Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0748 (SB0503) Family Law - Grounds for Divorce Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 (SB0417) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0872 Family Law - Modification of Child Custody or Denial of Visitation - Expedited Hearings Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0792) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1480 Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of Three Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0052 (HB0010) Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0104 Family Law - Grounds for Absolute Divorce - Time Requirements Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 (HB0022) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0178 Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0417 (HB0853) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0503 (HB0748) Family Law - Grounds for Divorce Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0534 (HB0631/CH0380) Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or Neglect Senator Shank 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 (HB0849) Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0620 (HB0715) Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 (HB1099) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1024 Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM