Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0006
Title
Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of 3 Years
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0007 (SB0012)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165 /CH0226
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Limited Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0273)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0414
Title
Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 (SB0078)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0524)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577 (SB0402)
Title
Family Law - De Facto Parent
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888 (SB0650)
Title
Family Law - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 (SB0272)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 (SB0550)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 (HB0007)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 (HB0503)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 (HB0924)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0220)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402 (HB0577)
Title
Family Law - De Facto Parent
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 /CH0353
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0575)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB1083)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB0888)
Title
Family Law - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0006 Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of 3 Years Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/28/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0007 (SB0012) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
1/28/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0165 /CH0226 Family Law - Grounds for Limited Divorce Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0220 (SB0273) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 /CH0414 Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to Magistrate Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0474 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 (SB0078) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 (SB0524) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0577 (SB0402) Family Law - De Facto Parent Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0888 (SB0650) Family Law - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0924 (SB0272) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1083 (SB0550) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0012 (HB0007) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 (HB0503) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0272 (HB0924) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 (HB0220) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0402 (HB0577) Family Law - De Facto Parent Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0472 /CH0353 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0575) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB1083) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0650 (HB0888) Family Law - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM