Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484 (SB0861)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812 (SB1032)
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955
Title
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165
Title
Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0484)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 (HB0812)
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0484 (SB0861) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0812 (SB1032) Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0955 Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0484) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1032 (HB0812) Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM