Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Family Law - Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application (I'm Alive Today App)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215 (SB0005/CH0297)
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427 /CH0360 (SB0403/CH0359)
Title
Behavioral Health Administration – Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot Program – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665 (SB0811)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0686 (SB0912)
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Adverse Actions - Absence Control Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975 (SB0907)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075
Title
Health - Informed Consent (Woman's Right to Know Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 /CH0297 (HB0215)
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0403 /CH0359 (HB0427/CH0360)
Title
Behavioral Health Administration – Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot Program – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 (HB0665)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0975)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB0686)
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Adverse Actions - Absence Control Policy
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0142 Family Law - Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application (I'm Alive Today App) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0215 (SB0005/CH0297) Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record Delegate Jackson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0402 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0427 /CH0360 (SB0403/CH0359) Behavioral Health Administration – Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot Program – Revisions Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0665 (SB0811) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0686 (SB0912) Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Adverse Actions - Absence Control Policy Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0975 (SB0907) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1075 Health - Informed Consent (Woman's Right to Know Act) Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1147 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0005 /CH0297 (HB0215) Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2019 - 4:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0403 /CH0359 (HB0427/CH0360) Behavioral Health Administration – Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot Program – Revisions Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Finance
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Applicability Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0811 (HB0665) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0907 (HB0975) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0912 (HB0686) Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Adverse Actions - Absence Control Policy Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM