Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Farmland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 (SB0391)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 /CH0003 (SB0275)
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 /CH0108
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400 (SB0364)
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0427)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837
Title
Family Farm - Prevailing Party - Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104 (SB0821)
Title
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003)
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 (HB0400)
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 (HB0106)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0427 (HB0796)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1104)
Title
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029 /CH0339
Title
Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 (SB0391) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0226 /CH0003 (SB0275) Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Economic Matters
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0378 /CH0108 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - Reimbursement Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0400 (SB0364) Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0427) Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0837 Family Farm - Prevailing Party - Attorney's Fees and Expenses Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1104 (SB0821) Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit Organizations Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003) Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0364 (HB0400) Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 (HB0106) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0427 (HB0796) Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 (HB1104) Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit Organizations Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1029 /CH0339 Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM