Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Farmland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0114
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 /CH0395 (SB0278/CH0396)
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779 (SB0719)
Title
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 /CH0373
Title
Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 (SB1016)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Modern Brewery License
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1531
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Winery Licenses - Auxiliary Winery Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 (SB0931)
Title
Local Jurisdictions - Zoning Authority - Generating Stations
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0278 /CH0396 (HB0586/CH0395)
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 (HB0779)
Title
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 /CH0353 (HB0768)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 (HB1592)
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016 (HB1307)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0155 /CH0114 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0586 /CH0395 (SB0278/CH0396) Maryland Farms and Families Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0779 (SB0719) Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017 Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1063 /CH0373 Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils Program Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 (SB1016) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 Alcoholic Beverages - Modern Brewery License Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1531 Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Winery Licenses - Auxiliary Winery Permits Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1592 (SB0931) Local Jurisdictions - Zoning Authority - Generating Stations Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0278 /CH0396 (HB0586/CH0395) Maryland Farms and Families Act Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0719 (HB0779) Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017 Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 /CH0353 (HB0768) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 (HB1592) Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1016 (HB1307) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM