Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Farmland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 (SB0268)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 /CH0672
Title
Land Use - Agritourism
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0354)
Title
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 /CH0542
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 (SB0759)
Title
Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar Farms
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
Environment - Sewage Sludge - Land Application
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 (SB0526)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1532 /CH0404 (SB0991/CH0405)
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203 /CH0548
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Fertilizer Use on Turf
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0222)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0396)
Title
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation Fee
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0526 (HB1493)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 /CH0644
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB1013)
Title
Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar Farms
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 /CH0405 (HB1532/CH0404)
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0222 (SB0268) Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0252 /CH0672 Land Use - Agritourism Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 (SB0354) Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation Fee Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 /CH0542 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1013 (SB0759) Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar Farms Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 Environment - Sewage Sludge - Land Application Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1493 (SB0526) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1532 /CH0404 (SB0991/CH0405) Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0023 Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0203 /CH0548 Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Fertilizer Use on Turf Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0222) Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Kelley)
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0396) Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation Fee Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0526 (HB1493) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 /CH0644 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0759 (HB1013) Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar Farms Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 /CH0405 (HB1532/CH0404) Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM