Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Farmland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020 /CH0566 (SB0344/CH0567)
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 (SB0270)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 (SB0510)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123 /CH0228
Title
Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 (SB0702)
Title
Healthy Climate Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0241
Title
Property Tax Assessments - Conservation Property - Alteration of Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0130
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0275)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0567 (HB0020/CH0566)
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510 (HB0636)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB1235)
Title
Healthy Climate Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0532)
Title
Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978
Title
Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1019
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Rural Legacy Program
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 /CH0566 (SB0344/CH0567) State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Ways and Means
1/17/2019 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0275 (SB0270) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0636 (SB0510) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1123 /CH0228 Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 (SB0702) Healthy Climate Initiative Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1350 /CH0241 Property Tax Assessments - Conservation Property - Alteration of Definition Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0130 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0270 (HB0275) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0567 (HB0020/CH0566) State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0510 (HB0636) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0702 (HB1235) Healthy Climate Initiative Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0744 (HB0532) Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0978 Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels Senator Serafini 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1019 Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Rural Legacy Program Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM