Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fertilizers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 (SB0027)
Title
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 (SB0963)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 (HB0193)
Title
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0011
Title
Agriculture - Fertilizer - Labeling and Restrictions on Use and Sale
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB0905)
Title
Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB0284)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0193 (SB0027) Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0284 (SB0963) Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0027 (HB0193) Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0070 /CH0011 Agriculture - Fertilizer - Labeling and Restrictions on Use and Sale Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 (HB0905) Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0963 (HB0284) Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM