Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fertilizers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0257)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536 (SB0345)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886 (SB0533)
Title
Bay Tax Equity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Products and Equipment - Repeal of Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0381)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 (HB0536)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 (HB0886)
Title
Bay Tax Equity Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Commercial Fertilizer
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0381 (SB0257) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0536 (SB0345) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management Equipment Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0886 (SB0533) Bay Tax Equity Act Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0928 Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Products and Equipment - Repeal of Exemption Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 (HB0381) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0345 (HB0536) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management Equipment Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0533 (HB0886) Bay Tax Equity Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0860 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Commercial Fertilizer Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM