Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fiduciaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 (SB0429)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0524)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Disclosure of Financial Records - Federal Investigation Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0531)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0575)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0531 (SB0429) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 (SB0524) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1100 Fiduciary Institutions - Disclosure of Financial Records - Federal Investigation Agencies Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0429 (HB0531) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0575) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM