Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fiduciaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0321/CH0064)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 /CH0365 (SB0239/CH0364)
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 (SB0262)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB0913)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0364 (HB0507/CH0365)
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0772)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0182
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 /CH0064 (HB0381)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties
Sponsor
Senator Peters
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB1229)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 /CH0459
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Private Equity and Venture Capital Investments
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0256 Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0381 (SB0321/CH0064) State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0507 /CH0365 (SB0239/CH0364) Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0772 (SB0262) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 (SB0913) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0239 /CH0364 (HB0507/CH0365) Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 (HB0772) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 /CH0182 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 /CH0064 (HB0381) State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties Senator Peters 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0913 (HB1229) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0982 /CH0459 State Retirement and Pension System - Private Equity and Venture Capital Investments Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM