Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fiduciaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0442)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 (SB0881)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 /CH0203 (SB0671/CH0202)
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Employee Ownership Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0416)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203)
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB0722)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0416 (SB0442) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0722 (SB0881) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 /CH0203 (SB0671/CH0202) Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 Employee Ownership Trusts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0442 (HB0416) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203) Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB0722) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM