Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0478
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0327
Title
Public Service Commission Reform Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 /CH0593 (SB0912/CH0592)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794
Title
Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274 (SB0836)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314 (SB0772)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470
Title
Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Purchase of Residence
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1570 (SB1119/CH0469)
Title
State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0006)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Discrimination in Housing - Military Status
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0341
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292
Title
Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for Refund
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0201
Title
Ethics - Local Government - Conflict of Interest and Financial Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658
Title
Retail Business Owners - Automated Teller Machines - Notice of Skimming Device
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB1314)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 (HB1274)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855
Title
Commercial Law - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 /CH0592 (HB0387/CH0593)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1119 /CH0469 (HB1570)
Title
State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0002)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0162 Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0188 /CH0478 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0327 Public Service Commission Reform Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0387 /CH0593 (SB0912/CH0592) Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Economic Matters
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Delegate Hammen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 (SB0836) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1314 (SB0772) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1470 Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Purchase of Residence Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1570 (SB1119/CH0469) State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers Delegate Gutierrez 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0002 (SJ0006) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 Discrimination in Housing - Military Status Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0341 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for Refund Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 /CH0201 Ethics - Local Government - Conflict of Interest and Financial Disclosure Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0658 Retail Business Owners - Automated Teller Machines - Notice of Skimming Device Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0772 (HB1314) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party President 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0836 (HB1274) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 Commercial Law - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 /CH0592 (HB0387/CH0593) Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1119 /CH0469 (HB1570) State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers Senator Rosapepe 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0002) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM