Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006)
Title
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200 /CH0160 (SB0064/CH0159)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0108
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 (SB0972)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 /CH0423 (SB0578/CH0424)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Reports - Bank Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791 (SB0748)
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 /CH0115
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise Fund
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158 (SB1209)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297 /CH0790
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1608
Title
Real Property - Trust Money - Escrow Trust Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1647
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479)
Title
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0159 (HB0200/CH0160)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0632 (HB0817)
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 (HB0791)
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0340
Title
Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972 (HB0463)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1209 (HB1158)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006) Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0200 /CH0160 (SB0064/CH0159) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0275 /CH0108 St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 (SB0972) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0633 /CH0423 (SB0578/CH0424) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0737 Election Law - Campaign Finance Reports - Bank Statements Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0791 (SB0748) Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1102 /CH0115 Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise Fund Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 (SB1209) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1297 /CH0790 Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Aumann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1608 Real Property - Trust Money - Escrow Trust Accounts Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1647 Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479) Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0064 /CH0159 (HB0200/CH0160) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0067 Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0632 (HB0817) Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0748 (HB0791) Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0755 /CH0340 Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0972 (HB0463) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts Senator Manno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1209 (HB1158) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM