Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 (SB0160)
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 (SB0034)
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0939)
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403
Title
Financial Institutions - State Banks - Investing in For-Profit Correctional Facilities - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1489 (SB0975)
Title
Governmental Entities - Authorization to Bank With Credit Unions
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1567 (SB0715)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0752)
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 (HB0274)
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621
Title
Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Considerations of a Mortgage Servicer - Borrower's Ability to Repay
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB1567)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801
Title
Civil Action - Surety Insurance - Failure to Act in Good Faith
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1196)
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 (HB1489)
Title
Governmental Entities - Authorization to Bank With Credit Unions
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0274 (SB0160) Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0750 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Prohibition Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0752 (SB0034) Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0855 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 (SB0939) Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1403 Financial Institutions - State Banks - Investing in For-Profit Correctional Facilities - Prohibited Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1489 (SB0975) Governmental Entities - Authorization to Bank With Credit Unions Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1567 (SB0715) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0015 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0034 (HB0752) Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/29/2020 - 2:45 PM
SB0160 (HB0274) Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0621 Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Considerations of a Mortgage Servicer - Borrower's Ability to Repay Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0715 (HB1567) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0801 Civil Action - Surety Insurance - Failure to Act in Good Faith Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1196) Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0975 (HB1489) Governmental Entities - Authorization to Bank With Credit Unions Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:54 PM