Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Planners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915 (SB0605)
Title
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605 (HB0915)
Title
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0915 (SB0605) Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Delegate Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0605 (HB0915) Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM