Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Regulation, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704 /CH0277 (SB0160/CH0276)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0421
Title
Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527
Title
Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0276 (HB0704/CH0277)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1091 /CH0579
Title
Financial Institutions - Registered Mortgage Loan Originators - Expedited Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0704 /CH0277 (SB0160/CH0276) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0723 /CH0421 Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1527 Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0160 /CH0276 (HB0704/CH0277) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1091 /CH0579 Financial Institutions - Registered Mortgage Loan Originators - Expedited Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM