Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Financial Regulation, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0478
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508 (SB0330)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794
Title
Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1377
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1450 /CH0393 (SB0471/CH0392)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1529
Title
Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0341
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 (HB0508)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 /CH0392 (HB1450/CH0393)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0188 /CH0478 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0508 (SB0330) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1377 Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1450 /CH0393 (SB0471/CH0392) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1451 Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1529 Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0341 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 (HB0508) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 /CH0392 (HB1450/CH0393) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page