Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Regulation, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045
Title
Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142 (SB0033)
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0253
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0607 (SB1022)
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 (SB1033/CH0617)
Title
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400 (SB1098)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1640 (SB0122)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Historic Diamond Press Building
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 /CH0484
Title
Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 /CH0479
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Surety Bond Requirements for Licensees and Registrants
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1022 (HB0607)
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1033 /CH0617 (HB0702)
Title
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1098 (HB1400)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0142 (SB0033) Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0182 /CH0253 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0607 (SB1022) Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0702 (SB1033/CH0617) Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Delegate Holmes 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1400 (SB1098) Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1640 (SB0122) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Historic Diamond Press Building Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 /CH0484 Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0924 /CH0479 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Surety Bond Requirements for Licensees and Registrants Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1022 (HB0607) Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1033 /CH0617 (HB0702) Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1098 (HB1400) Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM