Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Regulation, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1642 (SB1012)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1647
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 (HB1642)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1513 Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1642 (SB1012) Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1647 Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1012 (HB1642) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM