Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Regulation, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 /CH0090
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0093
Title
Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746 (SB0873)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0296 (SB0694)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0087
Title
Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Originators, and Servicers - Workgroup and Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 (HB0777/CH0296)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0746)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 /CH0090 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 /CH0093 Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0746 (SB0873) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 /CH0296 (SB0694) Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements Delegate Howard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1216 Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Licensing Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 /CH0087 Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0633 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Originators, and Servicers - Workgroup and Regulations Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0694 (HB0777/CH0296) Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0873 (HB0746) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM