Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Financial Regulation, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 /CH0443 (SB0939/CH0444)
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0499
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 /CH0444 (HB1196/CH0443)
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Delegate Jackson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0855 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 /CH0443 (SB0939/CH0444) Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0015 /CH0499 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Finance
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0754 Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0939 /CH0444 (HB1196/CH0443) Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/20/2020 11:29 AM