Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 /CH0348
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0712
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0639
Title
Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806 /CH0391
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
Maryland Compassionate Care Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0554)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372
Title
Health Occupation Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General Authority
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB1291)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648
Title
Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and Detention
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855
Title
Carroll County - Public Schools - Collection of Biometric Information from Students - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 /CH0348 State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Criminal History Records Checks Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0712 Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General Authority Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 /CH0639 Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0806 /CH0391 Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1100 Maryland Compassionate Care Act Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1255 Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0554) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 Health Occupation Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General Authority Senator Robey 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB1291) Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and Detention Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 Carroll County - Public Schools - Collection of Biometric Information from Students - Prohibited Senator Getty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM