Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017
Title
Firearms - Digital Fingerprint Record - Permit Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140 /CH0477 (SB0206)
Title
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0098
Title
State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current Employees
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0243)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 /CH0618 (SB0208)
Title
Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - Fingerprinting
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 /CH0077 (SB0629/CH0076)
Title
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0153)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Renewal Period for Retired Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1489 (SB0171)
Title
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0340
Title
Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0048
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB0732)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 (HB1489)
Title
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 (HB0140/CH0477)
Title
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Repeal of Sunset Provision and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0312/CH0618)
Title
Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - Fingerprinting
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0304)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 /CH0076 (HB0358/CH0077)
Title
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 /CH0236 (HB0972)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1142
Title
State Department of Education - McArdle Early Intervention Scholarship Program
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 Firearms - Digital Fingerprint Record - Permit Renewal Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0140 /CH0477 (SB0206) Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0164 /CH0098 State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current Employees Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0304 (SB0243) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0312 /CH0618 (SB0208) Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - Fingerprinting Delegate Saab 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0358 /CH0077 (SB0629/CH0076) Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0732 (SB0153) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236) St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1332 Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Renewal Period for Retired Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1489 (SB0171) Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records Check Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0340 Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - Repeal Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0109 /CH0048 Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 (HB0732) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0171 (HB1489) Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records Check Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0206 (HB0140/CH0477) Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Repeal of Sunset Provision and Program Evaluation President 6 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0208 (HB0312/CH0618) Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - Fingerprinting Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0243 (HB0304) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0629 /CH0076 (HB0358/CH0077) Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0995 /CH0236 (HB0972) St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1142 State Department of Education - McArdle Early Intervention Scholarship Program Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM