Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 (SB0215)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 /CH0195
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 (HB0471)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0471 (SB0215) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 /CH0195 Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 (HB0471) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM
Click to return on the top page